Cheung, Alicia Kit Fong (CPSO#: 71285)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2015


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Fountain Medical Centre 9425 Leslie Street Richmond Hill, ON L4B 3N7 Telephone: 905-770-8388
Date Received: 21 Mar 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2015