Cheung, Anson Wai-Chung (CPSO#: 70675)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2000