Cheung, Catherine Zee-Ming (CPSO#: 74757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5415
Fax: (905) 813-3855
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6407
Fax: (416) 323-6215
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Z.M. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheung ( CPSO# 74757 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
78 Grenville Street
10 East
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ZEE-MING CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004