Cheung, Chi-Yiu Mark (CPSO#: 32847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room C410A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4991
Fax: (416) 480-4563
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yip Tsui-Chun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yip ( CPSO# 32907 )
Dr. C. Cheung ( CPSO# 32847 )

Business Address:
KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Centres
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHI-YIU MARK CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1981