Cheung, Colleen Kwok-Yee (CPSO#: 71454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thornhill Medical Centre
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone: (905) 889-3634
Fax: (905) 889-3986
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colleen Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2014

Dr. C. Cheung ( CPSO# 71454 )

Business Address:
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-3634

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. COLLEEN KWOK-YEE CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999