Cheung, Francesca Ting Yan (CPSO#: 84371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Main Street Markham North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone: (905) 471-5022
Fax: (905) 471-1878
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Long Term Care
Home (Universal Care)
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mon Sheong Richmond Hill Long Term
Care Centre
11199 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1L2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francesca Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cheung ( CPSO# 84371 )

Business Address:
Mon Sheong Richmond Hill Long Term Care Centre
11199 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1L2

Business Address:
25 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone Number: (905) 471-5022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCESCA TING YAN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008