Cheung, Jason Chun-Bond (CPSO#: 65762)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002