Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cheung, Lily So-King (CPSO#: 27763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3282 Douglas Street
Burlington ON  L7N 1G9
Phone: (905) 639-5410
Fax: (905) 639-5410
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILY SO-KING CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1975