Cheung, Paul Kar-Chun (CPSO#: 96639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Equipe De Sante Familiale
Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul K. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cheung ( CPSO# 96639 )

Business Address:
Equipe De Sante Familiale Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 813-3850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL KAR-CHUN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012