Cheung, Po Kee (CPSO#: 61575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Alexandra Hospital
10240 Kingsway Avenue
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9
Phone: (780) 735-4111
Fax: (780) 425-0487

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PO KEE CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989