Cheung, Teresa Pui Chi (CPSO#: 70320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone: 9053731282
Fax: 9053739335
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodward & Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woodward ( CPSO# 70137 )
Dr. T. Cheung ( CPSO# 70320 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
201/203 - 316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone Number: (905) 373-1246

Business Address:
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone Number: (800) 268-7096

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA PUI CHI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998