Cheung, Vincent Yuk Tong (CPSO#: 63337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Cheung, Yuk Tong (used until: 21 Jun 1991 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Y. T. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010