Cheung, Wai Ming (CPSO#: 21814)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to: PO Box 87674 298 John Street Thornhill, ON L3T 7R4
Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to: Dr. W.M. Cheung Fax: 905-764-1307
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013


Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to: 390 Highlen Avenue Markham, ON L3S 4J3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013