Cheung, Wang Chi Thomas (CPSO#: 66702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5636 Glen Erin Drive
Unit 3
Mississauga ON  L5M 6B1
Phone: (905) 567-5991
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Wang Chi Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheung ( CPSO# 66702 )

Business Address:
3 - 5636 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5M 6B1
Phone Number: (905) 567-5991

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WANG CHI THOMAS CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995