Cheung, Warren James (CPSO#: 90775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
E Main Room EM 206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Warren J. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheung ( CPSO# 90775 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
E Main Room Em 206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN JAMES CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014