Chevalier, Marguerite Blanche (CPSO#: 68958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1275 Walker Road
Unit 2
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone: (519) 253-9116
Fax: (519) 253-5404
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marguerite Chevalier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chevalier ( CPSO# 68958 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Site
1030 Ouellette
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4417

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
1275 Walker Road
Suite 2
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 253-9116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGUERITE BLANCHE CHEVALIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEVALIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1997