Chew, Hall Fenn (CPSO#: 77489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Ophthalmology
Room M1 302B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5340
Fax: (416) 480-4481
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Chew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chew ( CPSO# 77489 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Ophthalmology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room M1-302B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALL FENN CHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008