Chia, Justin Chong-Hoe (CPSO#: 102864)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2016 to 08 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2015