Chiba, Naoki (CPSO#: 57136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Surrey Street West
Suite 105
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 836-8201
Fax: (519) 836-1341
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St, Guelph
Guelph ON  N1E4J4
Canada
Phone: 5198225350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Groves Memorial Hospital
235 Union St E, Fergus
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: 5198432010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naoki Chiba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chiba ( CPSO# 57136 )

Business Address:
105 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 836-8201

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOKI CHIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIBA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1987