Chidiac, Abdallah (CPSO#: 44737)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:St. Joseph's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2009