Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chien, Sin Ming (CPSO#: 58496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 410
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 287-1891
Fax: (416) 287-8218
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Chien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chien ( CPSO# 58496 )

Business Address:
Suite 410
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 287-1891

Business Address:
Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 292-5666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIN MING CHIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1992