Chien, Vincent (CPSO#: 66715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5431
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sinai Health Systems
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT CHIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 06 Oct 1997
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1997