Chih, Sharon Shiaw Yun (CPSO#: 92667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 2014

Expiry Date:  29 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H-1295
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7327
Fax: (613) 696-7359
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 17 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sharon Shiaw Yun Chih may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology,  University  of Ottawa, in which Dr. Chih
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Chih no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Chih's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Chih's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 17, 2014, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of July 29, 2018.  The expiry date of this certificate may be
                  extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.