Chik, Constance Lai-Yee (CPSO#: 32834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
University of Alberta
9th Floor, CSB
11350-83 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6G 2G3
Phone: (780) 492-3626
Fax: (780) 492-6444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSTANCE LAI-YEE CHIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1981