Chikazawa, Genta (CPSO#: 87515)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tsukuba Daigaku Igaku, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008