Child, Dumaresq Marner (CPSO#: 21208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1968

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
169 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B7
Phone: (519) 776-4217
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.M. Child Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Child ( CPSO# 21208 )

Business Address:
169 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 776-4217

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUMARESQ MARNER CHILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHILD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1968

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 27, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On July 27, 2017, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required general family medicine physician, Dr. Dumaresq Child to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Child to:

Practice under low-level clinical supervision for a period of four months.

Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the October 19, 2017, Medical Record Keeping Course at the University of Toronto.

Review Guidelines and Policies as outlined below:
o Medical Records Policy
o Canadian Task Force on Periodic Health Examinations
o Article from American Family Physician of Prostate Cancer Screening
o Guidelines on Cognitive Impairment: Recognition, Diagnosis, and Management in Primary Care.

Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.