Childs, Timothy James (CPSO#: 71446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4163
Fax: (613) 548-6076
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JAMES CHILDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHILDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002