Chin, Anthony (CPSO#: 53901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centres for Pain Management
500 King Street West
Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone: (905) 576-3444
Fax: (905) 576-7980
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chin ( CPSO# 53901 )

Business Address:
CPM Oshawa Pain Centre
Unit 2
500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone Number: (905) 576-3444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985