Chin, Jessica Wai Shan (CPSO#: 100839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 1N6
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chin ( CPSO# 100839)

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 1N6
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA WAI SHAN CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015