Chin, Lip Kuen Joseph (CPSO#: 50398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
E2-650, 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8451
Fax: (519) 685-8455
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Chin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chin ( CPSO# 50398 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Suite E2-650
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8451

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8451

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIP KUEN JOSEPH CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1984