Chin, Vannessa Marsha (CPSO#: 88071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  28 Jan 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
and Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2008 to 18 Feb 2008
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2008 to 04 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 29 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jan 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vannessa Marsha Chin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Chin holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Chin no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Chin's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Chin's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  January  29, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 28, 2023.