Chin, Yap Yok (CPSO#: 82157)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Malaya, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 04 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005