Chin-Sang, Hyacinth Beverly (CPSO#: 26275)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Jul 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002