Chin-Yee, Ian Harold (CPSO#: 57027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Haematology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8479
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hull / Chin-Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hull ( CPSO# 57318 )
Dr. I. Chin-Yee ( CPSO# 57027 )

Business Address:
499 Baker Street
London ON  N6C 1Y1
Phone Number: (519) 433-0505

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-218a
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8479

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN HAROLD CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990