Ching, Emily Kayee (CPSO#: 82404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Ching, Emily Ka Yee (used until: 22 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 335-1888
Fax: (905) 335-5656
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E Ching Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ching ( CPSO# 82404 )
Dr. N. Munce ( CPSO# 100949)

Business Address:
Unit 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY KAYEE CHING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009