Ching, Gemma Marie (CPSO#: 22420)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005