Chinnappa, Vinod (CPSO#: 84937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinod Chinnappa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chinnappa ( CPSO# 84937 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINOD CHINNAPPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHINNAPPA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017