Chinnasamy, Vimala Josephine (CPSO#: 62975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 Highway 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G2
Phone: (905) 631-1445
Fax: (905) 594-1237
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vimala Chinnasamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chinnasamy ( CPSO# 62975 )

Business Address:
410 Highway 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G2
Phone Number: (900) 563-1445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIMALA JOSEPHINE CHINNASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHINNASAMY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1994