Chinner, Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 24180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Xhosa

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records pertaining to 1371 Neilson Road practice location can be accessed via: Records Access Services Canada, Inc. 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia ON N7W 1A4 Tel: 1-800-971-8038 ext. 102
Date Received: 20 Sep 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anthony Joseph Chinner to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 22, 2017:

Dr. Chinner was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Chinner resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)