Chinyanga, Herbert Mapfumo (CPSO#: 42324)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997