Chipman, Nancy Louise (CPSO#: 33612)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Avenue Medical Centre, 221 Brant Avenue, Brantford, ON N3T 3J2
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015