Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chirico, James Charles Anthony (CPSO#: 50402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Parry Sound
District Health Unit
681 Commercial Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4E7
Phone: (705) 474-1400 Ext. 2375
Fax: (705) 474-8252
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James C.A. Chirico Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CHARLES ANTHONY CHIRICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIRICO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1986