Chis, Roxana Simina (CPSO#: 109688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROXANA SIMINA CHIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHIS is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018