Chisholm, James Douglas (CPSO#: 68240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ORNGE
5310 Explorer drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Canada
Phone: (647) 428-2005
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Douglas Chisholm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chisholm ( CPSO# 68240 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
ORNGE
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone Number: (647) 428-2005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DOUGLAS CHISHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISHOLM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999