Chisholm, Robert James (CPSO#: 23951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5490
Fax: (416) 864-5478
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2300 Yonge St #906
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: 647 776-2500
Fax: 647 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Chisholm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chisholm ( CPSO# 23951 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 7 152
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5490

Business Address:
906 - 2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Phone Number: (647) 776-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CHISHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISHOLM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971