Chisick, Laura Beth (CPSO#: 97411)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2012 to 02 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2015