Chisvin, Martin Joel (CPSO#: 55827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6649
Fax: (416) 469-6805
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin J. Chisvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chisvin ( CPSO# 55827 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN JOEL CHISVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISVIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1986