Chitaley, Anita (CPSO#: 88008)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Qadri, Anita Avinash (used until: 08 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nagpur University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 10 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015