Chittal, Shashikant Madhav (CPSO#: 26416)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1972 to 30 Jun 1972
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2004