Chittle, Andrea Diane (CPSO#: 88446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 836-7431
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wellington-Dufferin-Guelph Public
Health
Suite 100, R R 1
474 Wellington Road 18
Fergus ON  N1M 2W3
Canada
Phone: (800) 265-7293
Fax: (519) 846-0323
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Region of Waterloo Public Health
99 Regina Street South
2nd Floor
Waterloo ON  N2J 2R3
Canada
Phone: 519-883-2267
Fax: 519-621-5967
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chittle ( CPSO# 88446 )

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Business Address:
Wellington-Dufferin-Guelph Public Health
R.R. No 2
Suite 100
474 Wellington Road 18
Fergus ON  N1M 2W3
Phone Number: (800) 265-7293

Business Address:
Region of Waterloo Public Health
99 Regina Street South
2nd Floor
Waterloo ON  N2J 2R3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA DIANE CHITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011